Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Sponsored by
Senators Kelly, Smith, James, Salling, Guzzone, Augustine, Feldman, Lewis Young, Elfreth, McKay, Hettleman, Sydnor, King, Waldstreicher, Muse, Beidle, Folden, West, and Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain facts to be considered when determining whether a lack of consent exists for the purposes of certain sexual crimes; altering the elements of second-degree rape to remove the requirement of use of force or threat of force; and requiring the Maryland Judiciary to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1, 2024, and each October 1 thereafter.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0496
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963320/1
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {963320/1 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {963320/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 4:02 PM
Click to return on the top page