Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue certain licenses in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; and prohibiting certain license holders in certain areas of the 40th alcoholic beverages district from selling alcoholic beverages at certain times of day.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1221
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383424/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {383424/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Economic Matters 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 375
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - 40th Alcoholic Beverages District
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page