Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Rosapepe, Eckardt, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, Jackson, McCray, Salling, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit in the Governor's Grants Office for the purpose of tracking federal infrastructure grants and assisting State agencies in the award of the grants under the federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act of 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {443320/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Senate 3/22/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/17/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page