Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education and Labor and Employment - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program and Workforce Development for Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission, in consultation with the Cybersecurity Association of Maryland, Inc., on or before July 1 each year, beginning in 2023, to identify certification trends in information technology and cybersecurity sectors and expand the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program under certain circumstances; establishing the Cybersecurity Workforce Accelerator Program at the University of Maryland Baltimore County; establishing the Cybersecurity Workforce Accelerator Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Workforce Development - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-3)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Workforce Development - Cybersecurity
Senate 2/26/2022 2/26/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703227/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education and Labor and Employment - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program and Workforce Development for Cybersecurity
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing canceled
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Hearing 4/08 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513226/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-3) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page