Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering procedures for the claiming and awarding of grants under the Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program to allow an individual or corporation who paid or incurred qualified capital expenses during the immediately preceding calendar year to submit a grant application.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0914
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Winery and Vineyard Economic Development Grant Program - Modifications
Senate 3/07/2024 2/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Appropriations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:45 AM
Click to return on the top page