Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Beidle, Feldman, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to establish a Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee to assist in the development and implementation of a Parkinson's Disease Registry, determine what data should be collected and stored in a registry and the methods to ensure the privacy and confidentiality of the data, and advise the Department on Parkinson's disease and maintaining a registry; and requiring the Department to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on recommendations for the establishment of a registry.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Parkinson’s Disease Registry – Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health – Parkinson’s Disease Registry – Established
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {863024/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Parkinson's Disease Registry Advisory Committee - Established
(   18-1201 through 18-1203 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page