Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist, from July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2023, inclusive, to administer vaccinations to an individual who is at least 3 years old but under the age of 18 years if certain requirements are met; requiring the Prevention and Health Promotion Administration, in consultation with the State Board of Pharmacy, to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, certain information the Administration considers relevant to setting policies on the administration of vaccines to children by pharmacists; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994531/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (41-90)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-15)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {994531/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Floor Amendment {293028/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (41-90) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (117-15) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
Age
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page