Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Security Guards - Use of Force Reporting, Standards, and Certifications
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a use of force report from including information that is prohibited from disclosure by State or federal law; requiring the employer of a security guard providing security guard services on the premises of a health care facility to report certain information to the Secretary of State Police every 7 days; and altering the effective date of certain provisions of law relating to security guards from June 1, 2024, to January 1, 2025.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-10)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Security Guards - Use of Force Reporting - Health Care-Related Physical Interventions
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {883727/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Occupations and Professions - Security Guards - Use of Force Reporting, Standards, and Certifications
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (124-10) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page