Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Edwards, Waldstreicher, Guzzone, Zucker, Sydnor, Smith, Kramer, Klausmeier, Ready, Benson, Corderman, Gallion, Griffith, Hester, Elfreth, Carter, Hayes, Beidle, Augustine, Hettleman, Young, Rosapepe, Hershey, Ellis, Eckardt, Kagan, Carozza, Jackson, Salling, and Washington
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amount of income tax revenue from corporations that is distributed to a certain fund each year; and altering, beginning in fiscal year 2024, the amounts of capital grants calculated based on highway user revenues that are required to be appropriated to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1187
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0362 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {603920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {243429/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {603920/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Washington) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Floor Amendment {243429/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page