Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Armed Forces – Support of Military Families and Addition of Space Force
Sponsored by
Senators Jackson, Augustine, Brooks, Carozza, Feldman, Hester, Kagan, Lewis Young, M. Washington, and Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding the Space Force to certain provisions of law related to the armed forces; authorizing military spouses and residents of the State who are members of the National Guard of another state or a reserve component of the armed forces to terminate certain contracts at any time after the date the service member receives certain military orders to relocate; adding the Space Force and members of the National Guard of any other state to the definition of a "military-connected student" for purposes of the Purple Stars Schools Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1026
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883920/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Armed Forces – Support of Military Families and Addition of Space Force
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {883920/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Armed Forces – Support of Military Families and Addition of Space Force
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page