Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Hester, and Hough
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain public agencies from using seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student; prohibiting a public agency from using physical restraint and a nonpublic school from using physical restraint or seclusion as a behavioral health intervention for a student, except under certain circumstances; requiring the State Department of Education to develop an accountability system to measure compliance with regulations adopted on the use of physical restraint and seclusion; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433527/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {233424/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (13-31)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433527/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433527/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Floor Amendment {233424/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (13-31) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Referred Ways and Means 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {733020/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Text - Chapter - Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page