Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for financial assistance under the Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program to include individuals who purchase certain qualified property after a qualified project is completed, at an affordable sales price as determined by certain regulations, and as an owner-occupant.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program - Alterations
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:32 AM
Click to return on the top page