Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Elfreth, Smith, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing certain persons standing in certain environmental and natural resources protection proceedings; authorizing persons that meet certain standing requirements to bring certain civil actions under certain circumstances; requiring a plaintiff, under certain circumstances, to give certain notice and provide certain documentation to the Department of the Environment and the Attorney General in a certain manner and to file a certain affidavit; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1101
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223428/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-901 through 1-904, 9-344.1   )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page