Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Clarity Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that certain provisions governing signage at retail service stations supersede inconsistent local law; altering a signage requirement for retail service stations relating to the price of regular gasoline so that the signage prominently displays clearly and visibly the credit and debit price, if higher than the cash price, or the credit and debit price and the cash price; repealing an exemption from a certain signage requirement for retail service station dealers with not more than 3 dispensing units; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0882
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223625/1
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-8)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Gouging Act)
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223625/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Sale of Motor Fuel - Pricing Signage (Gas Price Clarity Act)
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-8) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Economic Matters 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page