Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles - Public Auction
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing persons on whose property an abandoned vehicle is found to sell at public auction the vehicle that is not reclaimed in a certain manner and for which a certain certificate is issued; requiring the seller of certain abandoned vehicles to reimburse themselves for certain costs and dispose of the proceeds of the sale in a certain manner; authorizing certain persons to apply to a certain law enforcement agency for authority to sell certain abandoned vehicles at public auction; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles - Public Auction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles - Public Auction
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   25-207, 25-209 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page