Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-4)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for an automated external defibrillator program in public middle and high schools; altering the requirements for actions to be taken by county boards of education regarding heat acclimatization for student athletes; and requiring middle schools and high schools to develop venue-specific emergency action plans for the operation and use of automatic external defibrillators, heat acclimatization, and coordination of care for other emergent injuries and severe weather for outdoor facilities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0836
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-4)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Reports (Elijah Gorham Act)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {563825/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act)
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {983527/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-4) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:02 PM
Click to return on the top page