Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Technology Development Corporation, subject to a written agreement, to provide certain outside entities administrative services or support and to receive compensation for providing the services or support.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0776
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2024 2/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Authority
Senate 3/07/2024 2/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 3/08/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page