Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Reilly, and Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and develop a plan regarding implementing a statewide 3-1-1 nonemergency telephone system; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Statewide 3–1–1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {898472/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Statewide 3–1–1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Senate 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {898472/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
(   1-301,   14-1101 through 14-1105 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page