Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission to develop recommendations relating to education and its impact on the criminal justice system; and requiring the Commission to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an interim report of its findings and recommendations by June 1, 2025, and a final report of its findings and recommendations by January 1, 2026.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-5)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {723423/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (129-5) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:28 AM
Click to return on the top page