Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Articulation Agreements and Transfer Procedures – Workgroup Study (Maryland Articulation and Transfer Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Articulation Agreements and Transfer Procedures of Institutions of Higher Education in the State to study obstacles encountered by students transferring between community colleges and four-year institutions of higher education in the State; and requiring the Workgroup to make recommendation to remedy any identified obstacles and report its findings to the Governor and the President of the Senate and the Speaker of the House by January 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education – Articulation Agreements and Transfer Procedures – Workgroup Study (Maryland Articulation and Transfer Act)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page