Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch may not prohibit a dealer from listing on the dealer's website a vehicle for sale or lease at a certain price, coerce or require a dealer to list a certain price on the dealer's website, or take an adverse action against a dealer for listing a certain price on the dealer's website; and defining "purchase price" as the full delivered price of a vehicle, excluding only taxes, title fees, and any freight or certain other disclosed dealer process charges.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0274
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0659 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page