Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Planning and the Department of General Services, in partnership with the Department of Housing and Community Development, to report to the Board of Public Works and certain committees of the General Assembly on strategies for the public or private development and use of surplus real property and excess real property retained for possible future use by the State as affordable housing on or before June 30, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Report on the Public or Private Conversion of State Property to Affordable Housing
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page