Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Sponsored by
Senators West and Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to approve the transfer of a Class B or Class D license in an eligible transferor district existing on a certain date to another election district under certain circumstances; prohibiting the Board from authorizing the transfer of more than a certain number of licenses out of an eligible transferor district; repealing a certain transfer schedule of Class B and Class D licenses from Election District 15; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843621/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Transfers
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Economic Matters 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453925/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page