Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for the establishment of a Baltimore City Soil Conservation District with boundaries that correspond to the boundaries of the City; adding Baltimore City to a geographic area from which the Secretary of Agriculture appoints the soil conservation district supervisors; requiring the Mayor of Baltimore City to take certain actions to form the District; requiring the Secretary of State to take certain actions to record the organization of the District; and providing for the appointment of the supervisors for the District.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page