Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment
Sponsored by
Senators Smith and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain law enforcement agencies from receiving a weaponized aircraft, drone, or vehicle, a destructive device, a firearm silencer, or a grenade launcher from a federal military surplus program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618376/1
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {618376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Public Safety – Surplus Military Equipment – Prohibition on Purchase by Law Enforcement Agencies
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {618376/1 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Committee Amendment {618376/1 Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Surplus Military Equipment
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page