Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Individuals with Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund to provide sailing, boating, kayaking, canoeing, paddleboarding, and surfing opportunities for individuals with disabilities and service-disabled veterans; requiring the Department of Disabilities to administer the Fund; establishing the qualifications for certain nonprofit organizations to receive grants from the Fund; and authorizing the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2026, to include $500,000 in the annual budget bill for the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0773
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {623121/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {583623/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
(   7-1101, 7-1102 )
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:34 AM
Click to return on the top page