Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements related to the conduct of a survey as part of the Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System and the reporting of summary data and trends reports.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Behavioral Risk Factor Surveillance System - Requirements
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page