Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain policy developed and published by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to require that a body-worn camera purchased or otherwise procured for use by a law enforcement officer on or after January 1, 2022, automatically record and save 2 minutes of audio and video footage immediately prior to the officer activating the record button on the device.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Law Enforcement – Body–Worn Cameras – Capabilities
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page