Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits – Retirees
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Augustine, Carozza, Corderman, Edwards, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Simonaire, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Salling, Watson, West, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retirees who began State service before July 1, 2011, to be eligible for prescription drug benefits in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; specifying that prescription drug benefits shall be discontinued for certain Medicare-eligible retirees who began State service on or after July 1, 2011, and their Medicare-eligible spouses and dependent children; repealing three Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug programs that provide coverage and assistance to certain retirees; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits – Retirees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Prescription Drug Benefits – Retirees
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page