Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Phasing out, over 2 taxable years, a certain limitation on the amount of certain military retirement income that may be included in a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0734
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0279 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page