Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain gas companies and authorizing certain gas companies to develop a plan for a pilot thermal energy network system or systems by October 1, 2024; requiring a gas company that serves at least 75,000 customers in its distribution territory to submit either one or two proposals for a pilot system to the Public Service Commission for approval by July 1, 2025; authorizing a municipal corporation, county, or community organization to submit neighborhoods to gas companies for consideration as part of a pilot system; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0397
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183225/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-7)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183225/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183225/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Thermal Energy Network Systems - Authorization and Establishment (Working for Accessible Renewable Maryland Thermal Heat (WARMTH) Act)
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (36-7) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-34) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-1001 through 7-1006, 7-703   )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page