Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Departments - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of funding required to be included in the State budget for local health services for certain fiscal years; altering the purposes for which local health department funding may be used to include protective equipment for certain health care personnel and materials appropriate to prepare for potential communicable disease emergencies; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to conduct a certain evaluation by December 1, 2021; requiring the Department to submit a certain report by December 15, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Departments - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Health Departments - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {183321/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-91)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-23)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Local Health Departments - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Local Health Departments - Funding
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Ready) Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Local Health Departments - Funding
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {974769/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Floor Amendment {183321/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (43-91) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (111-23) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Local Health Departments - Funding
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Last Updated: 6/2/2021 5:43 PM
Click to return on the top page