Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending through December 31, 2023, the taxable years for which a qualified farm may claim a certain credit against the Maryland income tax for the donation of fresh farm products for human consumption; extending through December 31, 2023, the period of time during which the State Department of Agriculture may issue certain tax credit certificates; extending through December 31, 2024, the period of time for which the Secretary of Agriculture, in consultation with the Comptroller, shall submit a certain report; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit – Food Donation Pilot Program – Extension
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:41 PM
Click to return on the top page