Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Stormwater Charges - Organizations Offering Agricultural Exhibitions
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an organization that offers agricultural exhibitions and is exempt from taxation under section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code from a certain stormwater charge established by Montgomery County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674434/1
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674434/1
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Montgomery County - Stormwater Charges - Organizations Offering Agricultural Exhibitions
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {674434/1 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator King) Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {674434/1 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-204 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page