Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections - Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City centralized booking facility to provide a secure, designated ballot drop box for eligible voters in the facility and to monitor the ballot drop box 24 hours a day and 7 days a week; requiring the Baltimore City centralized booking facility to disseminate written notifications directly to each eligible voter in the facility on how and when to use the drop box; requiring the State Board of Elections to provide the Baltimore City centralized booking facility with certain materials and the ballot drop box; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644339/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {952510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-44)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Centralized Booking Facility - Voting Information and Early Voting Polling Place
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {644339/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections- Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Judiciary 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {952510/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-44) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Senate Requests House Recede 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Washington and Lam) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Motion Recede (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 House Recede 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 646
Text - Chapter - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services and State Board of Elections - Centralized Booking Facility - Ballot Drop Box
(   1-303.1, 3-102 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page