Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Location Information (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain service providers to provide certain location information for certain electronic devices for up to 48 hours to a law enforcement agency or public safety answering point if the owner or user of the electronic device has been reported missing; prohibiting a person from being held civilly liable for making certain required disclosures; requiring the Department of State Police to collect and disseminate certain information under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1053
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary Economic Matters
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Location Information - Exigent Circumstances (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {763925/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Location Information (Kelsey Smith Act for Maryland)
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Judiciary Economic Matters 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page