Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Sponsored by
Senator A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission in the Department of Commerce to promote innovation in the fields of space exploration and commercial aerospace opportunities, including the integration of space, aeronautics, and aviation industries into the economy of the State; requiring the Commission to develop and annually update a certain strategic plan; and requiring the Commission, by October 1 each year, to submit a certain report to the Governor, the Maryland Economic Development Commission, and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0685
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563627/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {563627/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113324/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Beidle) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Maryland Aerospace and Technology Commission
(   10-1101 through 10-1115 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page