Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Entering into the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact is to regulate the practice of telepsychology across state boundaries; establishing certain criteria and duties for compact states; requiring certain psychologists to hold a certain license from a home state and meet certain eligibility requirements to exercise certain authority to practice interjurisdictional telepsychology and certain temporary authority to practice in-person, face-to-face psychology in certain compact states; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0970
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346481/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {346481/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page