Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain agencies, to annually collect certain information on the military and jobs, high schools, private career schools, and certain institutions of higher education in the State and to create and maintain a Student Horizon database on the Department's website that contains the information collected; requiring the Department to publish, and each local school system to distribute, the Student Horizon Scorecard on or before certain dates each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0132
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0584 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:58 PM
Click to return on the top page