Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Taxation of Business Property - Tax Rates, Exemptions, and Credits
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the county tax rate and municipal tax rate applicable to business personal property from exceeding $2 for each $100 of assessment; exempting business personal property from the property tax imposed by a county or municipal corporation, subject to certain exceptions; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on business property; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Taxation of Business Property - Tax Rates, Exemptions, and Credits
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page