Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Beidle, Brooks, Carter, Elfreth, Gile, Hettleman, Lam, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing maximum surcharges for certain eviction proceedings from $8 to $93 and prohibiting the District Court from assigning the surcharge against a tenant; altering the priority and criteria in the Statewide Rental Assistance Voucher Program that are followed by the Department of Housing and Community Development and public housing agencies for providing vouchers and housing assistance payments to families; limiting the maximum security deposit required by a residential lease to 1 month's rent; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, October 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page