Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, King, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to administer, in fiscal years 2022 and 2023, child care stabilization grants to provide financial support to child care providers that have faced a financial hardship or suffered an operational burden during the COVID-19 pandemic; and providing for the priority in grant awards.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0089
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {243121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text - First - Child Care Stabilization Grant Program and Child Care Expansion Grant Program - Established
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {243121/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Senate 3/24/2022 3/13/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2022 3/18/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Child Care Stabilization Grants
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page