Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of On-Site Wastewater Professionals in the Department of the Environment to regulate individuals who provide on-site wastewater services in the State and to establish minimum standards for certain on-site wastewater systems; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Board, to set certain fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses and other Board-provided services; establishing the On-Site Wastewater Professionals Fund; requiring the Board to establish a certain code of ethics; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0318
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, June 30, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-10)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {283921/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-10) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-401,   1-406,   9-11A-01 through 9-11A-23, 9-217.2   )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page