Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Time to Serve Act of 2024
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Brooks, Carozza, Carter, Charles, Corderman, Elfreth, Folden, Gallion, Gile, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, James, Lam, Mautz, McKay, Ready, Rosapepe, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of disaster service leave for employees in the Executive Branch of State government; and increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of paid leave the Secretary of Budget and Management may provide for uniformed services training or active uniformed services duty in a reserve unit of the armed forces or organized militia.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Reassigned to Finance 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:59 PM
Click to return on the top page