Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Entrepreneurial Innovation Programs - Establishment (Pava LaPere Legacy of Innovation Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Beidle, Brooks, Carter, Charles, Elfreth, Ferguson, Gile, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Lam, McKay, Ready, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pava LaPere Innovation Acceleration Grant Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants to technology-based startup companies that are founded by students of postsecondary institutions located in and have their principle places of business in the Baltimore-Columbia-Towson Metropolitan Statistical Area; establishing the Baltimore Innovation Initiative Pilot Program within the Maryland Innovation Initiative of the Corporation to provide incentives for and grow certain start-up companies; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Entrepreneurial Innovation Programs - Establishment (Pava LaPere Legacy of Innovation Act of 2024)
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {753824/1 Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Entrepreneurial Innovation Programs - Establishment (Pava LaPere Legacy of Innovation Act of 2024)
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Ways and Means 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-462, 10-462.1, 5-1702   )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 9:01 AM
Click to return on the top page