Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Expanded American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Carter, Smith, Watson, Ellis, Kramer, King, Washington, Elfreth, Guzzone, Jackson, Lam, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, in collaboration with local school systems, to develop, by December 1, 2022, content standards for expanded American history; requiring each county board of education, in collaboration with the local school system, to develop and implement certain curriculum guides for expanded American history; requiring each public school, by the 2023-2024 school year, to include expanded American history in the social studies curriculum; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0047
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Expanded American History - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   7-205.5 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page