Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program to be the Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers; requiring that Maryland Correctional Enterprises provide the proposed prevailing average market price of certain goods and services that are available from Maryland Correctional Enterprises to the Pricing and Selection Committee; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0723
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable with Amendments {573629/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Motion Recede (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (88-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Recede 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Text - Chapter - State Finance and Procurement - Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page