Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine and Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the Health Education Unit in the Office of the Attorney General is the State's office of consumer assistance under a certain federal law; establishing the Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care to assist State residents in accessing mental health and substance use disorder services under public and private health insurance and address insurance-related barriers to mental health and substance use disorder services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0517
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543322/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
(   13-4401 through 13-4410 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page