Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Carter, Hettleman, and Lee
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the limitations on the amount of compensatory damages and punitive damages that may be awarded to a complainant in a certain unlawful employment practice case; and increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, for which a claimant may recover back pay in a certain unlawful employment practice case.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0911 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-4)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273628/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unlawful Employment Practices - Remedies
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (40-4) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page