Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, King, Elfreth, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain confidentiality requirements for peer support counseling programs for fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entities; and requiring the Behavioral Health Administration, in consultation with the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, to issue a report on certain best practices relating to peer support counseling for fire, rescue, or emergency medical services entities and to make certain information regarding peer support counseling publicly available on the Administration's website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0581
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {263525/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2022 2/22/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Entities - Peer Support Programs
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page